Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eduard Angerer

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Archbishop of Selymbria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Dec 1816Born
19 Jul 184124.6Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
24 Jul 184124.6Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
26 Jun 187659.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
26 Jun 187659.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Alalis
16 Jul 187659.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Alalis
26 Jun 189073.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Selymbria
22 Aug 189881.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Eduard Angerer (VIAF: 168904638)
Archbishop Eduard Angerer (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}
Ordained BishopSt. Etienne, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 57.0 years
  • a bishop for 22.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 84, and Page 512
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017