Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johannes Baptist Rößler (Roessler)

Deceased

Bishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1850Born
15 Jul 187424.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Sankt Pölten, Austria
19 Jul 187424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Sankt Pölten, Austria
5 Jan 189443.5SelectedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
10 Apr 189443.7ConfirmedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
10 Jun 189443.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria
4 Jan 192776.5DiedBishop of Sankt Pölten, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johannes Baptist Rößler (Roessler) (VIAF: 289412910)
Bishop Johannes Baptist Rößler (Roessler) (born , died ) Bishop of Sankt Pölten

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNiederschrems, Diocese of Sankt Pölten
Ordained BishopS. Etienne, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 307
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1894, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017