Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Joseph Rudigier (Rudiger)

Deceased

Bishop of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1811Born
5 Apr 183523.9Ordained DeaconDeacon of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
12 Apr 183524.0Ordained PriestPriest of Brixen {Bressanone}, Italy
19 Dec 185241.7SelectedBishop of Linz, Austria
10 Mar 185341.9ConfirmedBishop of Linz, Austria
5 Jun 185342.1Ordained BishopBishop of Linz, Austria
12 Jun 185342.1InstalledBishop of Linz, Austria
29 Nov 188473.6DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Franz Joseph Rudigier (Rudiger) (VIAF: 50020800)
Bishop Franz Joseph Rudigier (Rudiger) (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlacePartenen/Vorarlberg
Ordained BishopS. Augustin, Vienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 31.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1853, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 13 Mar 2017