Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernest Maria Müller

Deceased

Bishop of Linz, Austria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jun 1822Born
13 Jul 184624.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
20 Jul 184624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
17 Feb 188562.6SelectedBishop of Linz, Austria
27 Mar 188562.7ConfirmedBishop of Linz, Austria
26 Apr 188562.8Ordained BishopBishop of Linz, Austria
3 May 188562.8InstalledBishop of Linz, Austria
28 Sep 188866.2DiedBishop of Linz, Austria

MicroData Summary for Ernest Maria Müller (VIAF: 81511258)
Bishop Ernest Maria Müller (born , died ) Bishop of Linz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIrritz, Diocese of Brno, Czech Republic
Ordained BishopSt Etienne, Cathedral, Vienna, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 42.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 344
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017