Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marc’Antonio Amalfitani

Deceased

Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1679BornCastel Monardo
23 Apr 170728.3Ordained PriestPriest
26 Sep 173556.7AppointedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
2 Oct 173556.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy
11 Nov 176586.8DiedBishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marc’Antonio Amalfitani:
Bishop Marc’Antonio Amalfitani (born , died ) Bishop of Ortona a Mare e Campli

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1762
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 6, Page 320

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013