Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Calebotta

Deceased

Bishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1693Born
28 Mar 171622.3Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Dec 171724.0Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 174652.5AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
26 Jun 174652.5Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
16 Feb 175662.2AppointedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia
28 Feb 175965.2DiedBishop of Šibenik (Knin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Calebotta
Bishop Giovanni Calebotta (born , died ) Bishop of Šibenik (Knin)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTrogir

  • a priest for 41.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 95, and Page 379
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,746, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast