Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Ortona a Mare e Campli

Dioecesis Ortonensis et Camplensis

United

To: Archdiocese of Lanciano (e Ortona)



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Ortona
20 October 1570RestoredDiocese of Ortona
Diocese of Ortona a Mare e Campli
12 May 1600Name ChangedDiocese of Ortona Diocese of Ortona a Mare e Campli
19 February 1834UnitedArchdiocese of Lanciano
Diocese of Ortona a Mare e Campli
Archdiocese of Lanciano (e Ortona)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 Aug 2014