Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Lancellotti

Deceased

Bishop of Nola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1576¹Born
26 Jan 161539.1AppointedBishop of Nola, Italy
25 Mar 161539.2Ordained BishopBishop of Nola, Italy
23 Jul 165680.6DiedBishop of Nola, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Lancellotti:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Lancellotti (died ) Bishop of Nola

  • a bishop for 41.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 260
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 57, Number 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014