Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esuperanzio Raffaelli

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Nov 1661AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
30 Nov 1661Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
24 Mar 1668DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

MicroData Summary for Esuperanzio Raffaelli
Bishop Esuperanzio Raffaelli (died ) Bishop of Penne e Atri

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCingoli d’Osimo

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 123, Number 750
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 276
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1661, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast