Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Milani

Deceased

Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1597¹BornTrevise
1 Jul 164144.5AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
7 Jul 164144.5Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
19 Dec 164447.9AppointedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia
1666¹69.0DiedBishop of Hvar (Lesina), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Milani:
Bishop Vincenzo Milani , Bishop of Hvar (Lesina)

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 278, and Page 133
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1641, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 17 Mar 2015