Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Climério Almeida de Andrade

Deceased

Bishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Feb 1924Born
27 Jun 194824.3Ordained PriestPriest
24 Sep 196238.5AppointedBishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
30 Dec 196238.8Ordained BishopBishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil
24 May 198157.2DiedBishop of Vitória da Conquista, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Climério Almeida de Andrade
Bishop Climério Almeida de Andrade (born , died ) Bishop of Vitória da Conquista

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Salvador da Bahia

  • a priest for 32.9 years
  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast