Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniel Patrick Yee Parcon

Bishop of Talibon, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Nov 1962 Born
29 Apr 199431.4Ordained PriestPriest of San Carlos, Philippines
3 Jun 201451.5AppointedBishop of Talibon, Philippines
22 Aug 201451.7Ordained BishopBishop of Talibon, Philippines
26 Aug 201451.7InstalledBishop of Talibon, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Daniel Patrick Yee Parcon
Bishop Daniel Patrick Yee Parcon (born ) Bishop of Talibon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallehermoso, Negros Oriental

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Talibon.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Jun 2014
  • ob/i: CB, 15 Jun 2014
  • c2+: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 220, Number 18,269

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 5 Jan 2017