Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wilfrid Emmett Doyle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nelson, British Columbia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Feb 1913BornCalgary
5 Jun 193825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Edmonton, Alberta, Canada
9 Nov 195845.7AppointedBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
3 Dec 195845.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
6 Nov 198976.7RetiredBishop of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada
14 Sep 200390.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Nelson, British Columbia, Canada

MicroData Summary for Wilfrid Emmett Doyle:
Bishop Wilfrid Emmett Doyle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nelson

  • a priest for 65.2 years
  • a bishop for 44.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015