Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Felice Accrocca

Archbishop of Benevento, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1959 Born
12 Jul 198626.6Ordained PriestPriest of Latina-Terracina-Sezze-Priverno, Italy
18 Feb 201656.2AppointedArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
15 May 201656.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Benevento, Italy
12 Jun 201656.5InstalledArchbishop of Benevento, Italy

MicroData Summary for Felice Accrocca
Archbishop Felice Accrocca (born ) Archbishop of Benevento

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCori

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Benevento.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2016
  • ob/i: CB, 27 Feb 2016
  • c2+: CB, 5 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 24 Apr 2017