Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Chiappe

Deceased

Bishop of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Sep 1873Born
30 May 189622.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 192249.0AppointedBishop of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
28 Oct 192249.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy
26 Aug 195177.9DiedBishop of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Chiappe
Bishop Giovanni Battista Chiappe (born , died ) Bishop of Gerace (-Santa Maria di Polsi)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOnzo
Ordained BishopAlbenga, Diocese of Albenga

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1922, Number 65
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,217

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast