Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Hermosillo

Archidioecesis Hermosillensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Ruy Rendón Leal, Archbishop
  • José Ulises Macías Salcedo, Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 13 July 1963
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Sonora
  • Country: México
  • Square Kilometers: 36,991 (14,287 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Noroeste
  • Official Web Site: https://www.arquidiocesisdehermosillo.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Dr. Paliza y Ocampo s/n, Col. Centenario, 83260 Hermosillo, Son., México
  • Telephone: (662)213-21-38; 217-23-39
  • Fax: 213-13-27

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Sonora
7 May 1779ErectedDiocese of Durango Diocese of Sonora (erected)
27 April 1840Territory LostDiocese of Sonora Diocese of California (Two Californias, Both Californias) (erected) (Old and New California)
24 May 1883Territory LostDiocese of Sonora Diocese of Sinaloa (erected)
23 June 1891Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Sonora (From Guadalajara (Mexico) to Durango (Mexico))
22 November 1958Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Sonora (from Durango)
20 June 1959Territory LostDiocese of Sonora (Ciudad Obregón (Olim Cajeme), Guaymas, Bácum, Navojoa, Etchojoa, Huatabampo, Alamos, Quiriego, Rosario, Yécora, Onavas, La Colorada, San Javier, Mazatán, Villa Pesqueira, Suaqui Grande, Sahuaripa, Bacanora, Soyopa, Arivechi, Batuc, San Pedro de la ...) Diocese of Ciudad Obregón (erected)
Diocese of Hermosillo
1 September 1959Name ChangedDiocese of Sonora Diocese of Hermosillo
Archdiocese of Hermosillo
13 July 1963ElevatedDiocese of Hermosillo Archdiocese of Hermosillo
25 March 1966Territory LostArchdiocese of Hermosillo (Puerto Peñasco)
Vicariate Apostolic of Tijuana (Mexicali, San Louis Rio Colorado, parts of Inseñada, and the Island of Angél de la Guarda)
Diocese of Mexicali (erected)
19 March 2015Territory LostArchdiocese of Hermosillo (Agua Prieta, Altar, Atil, Bacoachi, Caborca, Cananea, Fronteras, Imuris, Naco, Nacozari de García, Nogales, Oquitoa, Pitiquito, Santa Crux, Sáric, Trincheras, and Tubutama) Diocese of Nogales (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Sonora
1948324,000360,00090.0%313110,4518529ap1951
Diocese of Hermosillo
Archdiocese of Hermosillo
1966348,000353,00098.6%56566,2141210321ap1967
1968374,220378,00099.0%59596,3421111021ap1971
1976498,110508,36098.0%72726,918716134ap1977
1980572,000590,00096.9%801817,061813037ap1981
1990882,000922,00095.7%7527711,4541815058ap1991
19991,932,0001,992,22997.0%115311816,3721913558ap2000
20001,932,0001,992,40097.0%1121012215,83611614358ap2001
20011,020,0001,052,24096.9%122111337,6691159559ap2002
2002955,5671,052,24090.8%99141138,45611815057ap2003
2003955,5671,052,24090.8%115131287,46511814257ap2004
2004970,3181,067,05190.9%10481128,66311314255ap2005
20061,003,4891,100,32291.2%11381218,29311313558ap2007
20131,088,0221,236,23288.0%13331368,0001711775ap2014
2015706,624753,05293.8%1136,2536449bul:19Mar2015
2016706,624753,05293.8%933967,360172849ap2017
2019731,770991,00073.8%91918,041138266ap2020
2021766,100905,00084.7%94161106,9641196766ap2022

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Sonora
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 383
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 349
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 408, to Page 410
  • Diocese of Hermosillo
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 51, Page 716, and Page 717
  • Archdiocese of Hermosillo
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 56, Page 496, and Page 497

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 22 Aug 2023