Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Faustino Armendáriz Jiménez

Archbishop of Durango, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1955 Born
11 Sep 198227.1Ordained PriestPriest of Hermosillo, Sonora, México
4 Jan 200549.4AppointedBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
23 Feb 200549.5Ordained BishopBishop of Matamoros, Tamaulipas, México
20 Apr 201155.7AppointedBishop of Querétaro, México
21 Sep 201964.1AppointedArchbishop of Durango, México
21 Nov 201964.3InstalledArchbishop of Durango, México

MicroData Summary for Faustino Armendáriz Jiménez
Archbishop Faustino Armendáriz Jiménez (born ) Archbishop of Durango

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagdalena de Kino
Ordained BishopCentro de Convenciones Mundo Nuevo, Matamoros, Diocese of Matamoros, Tamaulipas

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Durango.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,827
  • ab: Bollettino, 20 Apr 2011
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Sep 2019
  • i: CB, 23 Sep 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast