Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Avezzano

Dioecesis Marsorum



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giovanni Massaro, Bishop
  • Pietro Santoro, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 30 September 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of L’Aquila
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Italy
  • Square Kilometers: 1,700 (656 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Abruzzo-Molise
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesidiavezzano.it
  • Mailing Address: Vescovado, Corso della Liberta 54, 67051 Avezzano [L'Aquila], Italia
  • Telephone: 0863.41.38.27
  • Fax: 0863.41.27.25

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Marsi
9th CenturyErectedDiocese of Marsi (erected)
29 May 1922Territory LostDiocese of Marsi (Tram˙tola) Territorial Abbey of Santissima TrinitÓ di Cava de’ Tirreni
15 August 1972Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Marsi (from Immediately Subject to L’Aquila)
Diocese of Avezzano
30 September 1986Name ChangedDiocese of Marsi Diocese of Avezzano

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Marsi
188691,065.0%243076OTC
1950124,700125,00099.8%105281339372512585ap1951
1969129,850130,00099.9%107341419204128392ap1971
1980113,000113,40099.6%101321338493918098ap1981
Diocese of Avezzano
1990107,500109,00098.6%12834162663438218100ap1991
1999118,120120,50098.0%8732119992537186100ap2000
2000117,908121,50097.0%90251151,025530178100ap2001
2001115,600118,00098.0%78251031,12252517097ap2002
2002115,600118,00098.0%84291131,02352917298ap2003
2003115,000118,00097.5%80221021,12752217298ap2004
2004115,000118,00097.5%78221001,15052217298ap2005
2006109,000115,13794.7%80291091,00053013095ap2007
2012109,380119,21091.8%78251031,06152612897ap2013
2015115,186122,24194.2%82261081,06652912997ap2016
2018108,000122,23088.4%7225971,11352511497ap2019
2020107,200120,30189.1%7617931,152519109100ap2021
2022105,500115,95091.0%8115961,09881788100ap2023

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Diocese of Marsi
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 327, and Page 328
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 186
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 236
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 232
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 257
    • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 277
    • Series Episcoporum Ecclesiae Catholicae, Volume 1, Page 893
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 16, Page 262, and Page 263
  • Diocese of Avezzano
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 79, Page 447, and Page 448

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
Code: web_d, v3.4.6, 4 Feb 2024; Data: 14 Apr 2024