Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Muti

Deceased

Bishop of Spoleto, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Oct 1363AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
17 Dec 1365AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
18 Jul 1371AppointedBishop of Spoleto, Italy
1372¹DiedBishop of Spoleto, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Muti
Bishop Giacomo Muti (died 1372) Bishop of Spoleto

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 461, and Page 104
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 327

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 27 May 2021

Quantcast