Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
18 Apr 1395SelectedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
18 Sep 1395ConfirmedBishop of Pozzuoli, Italy
20 Nov 1398AppointedBishop of Marsi, Italy
1418¹ResignedBishop of Marsi, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo
Bishop Filippo , Bishop Emeritus of Marsi

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 409, and Page 328

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Jun 2021

Quantcast