Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eusebio Septimio Mari, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Riohacha, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Pachnemunis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Mar 1916Born
23 Jul 193923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
21 Feb 195437.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Riohacha, Colombia
21 Feb 195437.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pachnemunis
1 May 195438.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pachnemunis
21 Dec 196549.7DiedVicar Apostolic of Riohacha, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Eusebio Septimio Mari
Bishop Eusebio Septimio Mari O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Riohacha

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTresacco

  • a priest for 26.4 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1954

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast