Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Antonio García y Suárez

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Granada, Nicaragua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1899Born
2 Apr 192223.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Mar 195354.0AppointedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
24 May 195354.2Ordained BishopBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
14 Jul 197273.4ResignedBishop of Granada, Nicaragua
15 Jul 197273.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Granada, Nicaragua

MicroData Summary for Marco Antonio García y Suárez
Bishop Marco Antonio García y Suárez (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTerrabona
Ordained BishopManagua, Archdiocese of Managua

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 19.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 46, Number 3,117

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast