Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Cosmas Zumaire Lungu

Bishop of Chipata, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Feb 1960 Born
29 Aug 198525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Chipata, Zambia
23 Dec 200242.8AppointedBishop of Chipata, Zambia
23 Feb 200343.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chipata, Zambia

MicroData Summary for George Cosmas Zumaire Lungu
Bishop George Cosmas Zumaire Lungu (born ) Bishop of Chipata

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZumaire

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chipata.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 170, Number 14,338

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 15 Jan 2021

Quantcast