Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benjamin S. Phiri

Bishop of Ndola, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jun 1959 Born
14 Sep 198627.2Ordained PriestPriest of Chipata, Zambia
15 Jan 201151.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Chipata, Zambia
15 Jan 201151.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nachingwea
9 Apr 201151.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nachingwea
3 Jul 202061.0AppointedBishop of Ndola, Zambia
15 Aug 202061.1InstalledBishop of Ndola, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Benjamin S. Phiri (VIAF: 311213392)
Bishop Benjamin S. Phiri (born ) Bishop of Ndola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChongololo, Diocese of Chipata
Ordained BishopSaint Anne, Cathedral, Chipata, Diocese of Chipata

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ndola.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 15 Jan 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 16 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,033
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jul 2020
  • i: CB, 13 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast