Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles Joseph Sampa Kasonde

Bishop of Solwezi, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1968 Born
4 Aug 200132.6Ordained PriestPriest of Ndola, Zambia
23 Mar 201041.2AppointedBishop of Solwezi, Zambia
29 May 201041.4Ordained BishopBishop of Solwezi, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Charles Joseph Sampa Kasonde
Bishop Charles Joseph Sampa Kasonde (born ) Bishop of Solwezi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKalulushi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Solwezi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,649

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022