Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabian Yu Yuwen (Yu Teh-guen)

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Kiating [Leshan], China

Titular Bishop of Phacusa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1890Born
31 Oct 192030.0Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jul 193645.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Yachow, China
7 Jul 193645.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Phacusa
15 Nov 193646.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Phacusa
6 Mar 194352.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Kiating [Leshan], China

MicroData Summary for Fabian Yu Yuwen (Yu Teh-guen)
Bishop Fabian Yu Yuwen (Yu Teh-guen) (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Kiating [Leshan]

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYukiakow, Fenchow

  • a priest for 22.3 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1936, Number 82
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 26 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast