Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Marie-Rodrigue Cardinal Villeneuve, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Québec, Canada

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1883Born
25 May 190723.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
16 Jun 193046.6SelectedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
3 Jul 193046.6ConfirmedBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
11 Sep 193046.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
17 Sep 193046.8InstalledBishop of Gravelbourg, Saskatchewan, Canada
11 Dec 193148.1AppointedArchbishop of Québec, Canada
13 Mar 193349.3Elevated to Cardinal
13 Mar 193349.3AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
17 Jan 194763.2DiedArchbishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jean-Marie-Rodrigue Villeneuve
Jean-Marie-Rodrigue Cardinal Villeneuve O.M.I. (born , died ) Archbishop of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal

  • a priest for 39.6 years
  • a bishop for 16.3 years
  • a cardinal for 13.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1930, Number 57
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 596, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 14, Number 760, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 845, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast