Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Elzéar-Alexandre Cardinal Taschereau

Deceased

Archbishop of Québec, Canada

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1820Born
10 Sep 184222.5Ordained PriestPriest of Québec, Canada
24 Dec 187050.8AppointedArchbishop of Québec, Canada
19 Mar 187151.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Québec, Canada
7 Jun 188666.3Elevated to Cardinal
17 Mar 188767.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
12 Apr 189878.1DiedArchbishop of Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Elzéar-Alexandre Taschereau (VIAF: 122256608)
Elzéar-Alexandre Cardinal Taschereau (born , died ) Archbishop of Québec

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSainte-Marie de la Beauce, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained PriestSainte-Marie-de-la-Nouvelle-Beauce, Church, Sainte-Marie de la Beauce, Archdiocese of Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Québec, Archdiocese of Québec
Death PlaceQuébec, Archdiocese of Québec
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Québec, Archdiocese of Québec

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
  • a cardinal for 11.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 473, and Page 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Jun 1886
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 7
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 596, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 845, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast