Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mathurin Blanchet, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

Titular Bishop of Limata


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1892Born
29 Jun 192129.3Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
18 Feb 194653.9AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
3 Mar 194654.0Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
15 Oct 196876.6RetiredBishop of Aosta, Italy
15 Oct 196876.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Limata
9 Nov 197482.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mathurin Blanchet
Bishop Mathurin Blanchet O.M.I. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Aosta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGressan
Ordained BishopSainte-Marie des Anges, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1946, Number 12
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast