Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Raúl Vera López, O.P.

Bishop Emeritus of Saltillo, Coahuila, México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jun 1945 Born
29 Jun 197530.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Nov 198742.4AppointedBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
6 Jan 198842.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ciudad Altamirano, Guerrero, México
14 Aug 199550.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Cristóbal de Las Casas, Chiapas, México
30 Dec 199954.5AppointedBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México
21 Nov 202075.4RetiredBishop of Saltillo, Coahuila, México

MicroData Summary for José Raúl Vera López
Bishop José Raúl Vera López O.P. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saltillo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAcámbaro
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saltillo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107, Number 9,427
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 21 Nov 2020

Quantcast