Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Turner

Deceased

Bishop of Buffalo, New York, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Apr 1871Born
13 Aug 189322.3Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Augustine, Florida, USA
10 Mar 191947.9AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
30 Mar 191947.9Ordained BishopBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
10 Jul 193665.2DiedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for William Turner
Bishop William Turner (born , died ) Bishop of Buffalo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKilmallock, Ireland

  • a priest for 42.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1919, Number 19
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast