Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Duncan Theodore Tsoke

Bishop of Kimberley, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1964 Born
2 Dec 199531.6Ordained PriestPriest of Johannesburg, South Africa
6 Feb 201651.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
6 Feb 201651.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
30 Apr 201652.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Horrea Coelia
3 Mar 202156.8AppointedBishop of Kimberley, South Africa
17 Apr 202157.0InstalledBishop of Kimberley, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Duncan Theodore Tsoke
Bishop Duncan Theodore Tsoke (born ) Bishop of Kimberley

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDaveyton
Ordained BishopSacred Heart College, Johannesburg, Archdiocese of Johannesburg

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kimberley.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Feb 2016
  • ob: CB, 25 Feb 2016
  • c2: CB, 12 Apr 2016
  • c34: CB, 30 Apr 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 228, Number 18,901
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Mar 2021
  • i: CB, 13 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 17 Apr 2021

Quantcast