Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste Boivin, S.M.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire

Titular Archbishop of Viminacium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1898Born
22 Dec 192325.7Ordained PriestPriest of Society of African Missions
15 Mar 193941.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Costa d’Avorio
15 Mar 193941.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Onuphis
30 May 193941.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Onuphis
9 Apr 194042.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
14 Sep 195557.5AppointedArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
10 Jun 195961.2ResignedArchbishop of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire
10 Jun 195961.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Viminacium
24 Apr 197072.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Abidjan, Côte d’Ivoire

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste Boivin
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste Boivin S.M.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Abidjan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHénanbihen, France

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 29
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 848, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast