Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nunciature to Ethiopia



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Nunciature
  • Elevated: 20 March 1957
  • Diplomatic Post
  • Country: Ethiopia
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 588, N. 1815, W. 03, Nifas Silk Lafto Sub City, Addis Ababa, Ethiopia
  • Telephone: (251-11)371.21.00
  • Fax: 371.14.99

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Delegation to Italian East Africa
25 March 1937EstablishedDelegation to Egypt, Arabia, Eritrea, Ethiopia, Palestine, TransJordan, and Island of Cyprus Delegation to Italian East Africa
Delegation to Ethiopia
1946Name ChangedDelegation to Italian East Africa Delegation to Ethiopia
Nunciature to Ethiopia
20 March 1957ElevatedDelegation to Ethiopia Nunciature to Ethiopia (as Internunciature)
8 March 1969ElevatedNunciature to Ethiopia (to Nunciature)

Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased



Source(s)

  • Delegation to Italian East Africa
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 29, Page 394, and Page 395
  • Nunciature to Ethiopia
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 49, Page 823
    • Acta Apostolicae Sedis, Volume 61, Page 306, and Page 307
  • ============

    Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
    Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
    Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
    Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
    Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
    Eastern Catholic Churches

    ============

    About Catholic-Hierarchy
    Terminology/Site Help
    [ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024
    Code: web_d, v3.4.7, 20 Apr 2024; Data: 20 May 2024