Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sebastião Thomás, O.P. †

Deceased

Prelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Plataea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Apr 1876Born
8 Jan 189922.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
18 Dec 192448.7AppointedPrelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil
18 Dec 192448.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Plataea
15 Nov 192549.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Plataea
19 Dec 194569.7DiedPrelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Sebastião Thomás
Bishop Sebastião Thomás O.P. (born , died ) Prelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoussennac, France

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1925, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast