Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanislav Szyrokoradiuk, O.F.M.

Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol, Ukraine


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1956 Born
4 Jun 198427.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Aug 198832.1Perpetual VowsPriest of Order of Friars Minor
26 Nov 199438.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zytomir, Ukraine
26 Nov 199438.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Surista
6 Jan 199538.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Surista
24 Jul 201256.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lutsk, Ukraine
12 Apr 201457.8AppointedBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
29 May 201457.9InstalledBishop of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
2 Feb 201962.6AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol, Ukraine
2 Feb 201962.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
14 Feb 202063.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Kharkiv-Zaporizhia, Ukraine
18 Feb 202063.6SucceededBishop of Odessa-Simferopol, Ukraine

MicroData Summary for Stanislav Szyrokoradiuk (VIAF: 507154867587160100001)
Bishop Stanislav Szyrokoradiuk O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Odessa-Simferopol

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKornachovka
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Odessa-Simferopol.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,463
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Jul 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 12 Apr 2014
  • sole: CB, 15 Nov 2017
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2019
  • s: Bollettino, 18 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast