Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Adrianus Johannes Cardinal Simonis

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1931Born
22 Sep 195624.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Rotterdam, Netherlands
15 Jun 195725.5Ordained PriestPriest of Rotterdam, Netherlands
29 Dec 197039.0AppointedBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
20 Mar 197139.3Ordained BishopBishop of Rotterdam, Netherlands
27 Jun 198351.5AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
3 Dec 198352.0SucceededArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
25 May 198553.4Elevated to Cardinal
25 May 198553.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
14 Apr 200775.3RetiredArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
2 Sep 202088.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Adrianus Johannes Simonis (VIAF: 49269574)
Adrianus Johannes Cardinal Simonis (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLisse, Diocese of Rotterdam
Ordained DeaconMajor Seminary, Chapel, Warmond
Ordained PriestSaint Laurentius aan de Westzeedijk, Cathedral, Rotterdam, Diocese of Rotterdam
Ordained BishopSaint Laurentius aan de Westzeedijk, Cathedral, Rotterdam, Diocese of Rotterdam
Death PlaceHospice, Sassenheim

  • a priest for 63.2 years
  • a bishop for 49.4 years
  • a cardinal for 35.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Apr 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 671
  • d: CB, 2 Sep 2020
  • d.loc: CB, 5 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast