Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jozef Marianus Punt

Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem-Amsterdam, Netherlands


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1946 Born
9 Jun 197933.4Ordained PriestPriest of Haarlem, Netherlands
1 Apr 199549.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
1 Apr 199549.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Nasai
1 Apr 199549.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Netherlands, Military
1 Jul 199549.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nasai
15 Sep 199852.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Haarlem, Netherlands
21 Jul 200155.5AppointedBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
29 Sep 200155.7InstalledBishop of Haarlem, Netherlands
1 Jun 202074.3RetiredBishop of Haarlem-Amsterdam, Netherlands
1 Jun 202074.3RetiredApostolic Administrator of Netherlands, Military

MicroData Summary for Jozef Marianus Punt
Bishop Jozef Marianus Punt (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Haarlem-Amsterdam

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlkmaar
Ordained BishopSaint Bavon, Cathedral, Haarlem, Diocese of Haarlem

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Haarlem-Amsterdam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,571
  • aadm/i: AM, 22 Dec 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast