Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Everardus Johannes de Jong

Auxiliary Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands

Titular Bishop of Cariana

Apostolic Administrator of Netherlands, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jul 1958 Born
28 May 198324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Roermond, Netherlands
12 Dec 199840.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Roermond, Netherlands
12 Dec 199840.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cariana
6 Feb 199940.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cariana
1 Jun 202061.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Netherlands, Military

MicroData Summary for Everardus Johannes de Jong
Bishop Everardus Johannes de Jong (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Roermond

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEindhoven
Ordained BishopSaint Christophe, Cathedral, Roermond, Diocese of Roermond

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Roermond.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,469
  • ab: Bollettino, 1 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast