Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bernardus Johannes Cardinal Alfrink

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

Cardinal-Priest of San Gioacchino ai Prati di Castello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1900Born
15 Aug 192424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Utrecht, Netherlands
28 May 195150.8AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
28 May 195150.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
17 Jul 195151.0Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyana
31 Oct 195555.3AppointedArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
16 Apr 195756.7AppointedArchbishop of Netherlands, Military
28 Mar 196059.7Elevated to Cardinal
31 Mar 196059.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Gioacchino ai Prati di Castello
6 Dec 197575.4RetiredArchbishop of Utrecht, Netherlands
6 Dec 197575.4RetiredArchbishop of Netherlands, Military
16 Dec 198787.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Utrecht, Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Bernardus Johannes Alfrink (VIAF: 97617067)
Bernardus Johannes Cardinal Alfrink (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Utrecht

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNijkerk, Archdiocese of Utrecht
Ordained PriestSt. Catharina, Cathedral, Utrecht, Archdiocese of Utrecht
Ordained BishopSt. Catharina, Cathedral, Utrecht, Archdiocese of Utrecht
Death PlaceNieuwegein, Hospital, Utrecht, Archdiocese of Utrecht
Buried Place (Original)St. Barbara, Cemetery, Utrecht, Archdiocese of Utrecht

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.4 years
  • a cardinal for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1951, Number 71
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 8, Number 368, Ascendance
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 13, Number 671, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast