Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin-Joseph-Marie Simeone

Deceased

Bishop of Fréjus, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Sep 1863Born
1888²24.2Ordained PriestPriest of Marseille, France
27 May 191652.6AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
31 Aug 191652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
27 Sep 191653.0InstalledBishop of Ajaccio, France
30 Jul 192662.8AppointedBishop of Fréjus, France
22 Oct 194077.0DiedBishop of Fréjus, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Augustin-Joseph-Marie Simeone
Bishop Augustin-Joseph-Marie Simeone (born , died ) Bishop of Fréjus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMarseille

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 36
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1916, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast