Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Joseph Schmitt

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1911Born
14 Jul 193524.2Ordained PriestPriest
29 May 195847.1SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Metz, France
5 Jul 195847.2ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Metz, France
5 Jul 195847.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Centenaria
13 Nov 195847.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centenaria
30 Nov 195847.6SucceededBishop of Metz, France
198775.7RetiredBishop of Metz, France
9 Sep 198776.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Paul Joseph Schmitt
Bishop Paul Joseph Schmitt (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBasse-Yutz

  • a priest for 52.1 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 846, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast