Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilbert-Antoine Duchêne

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1919Born
14 Jul 194626.9Ordained PriestPriest of Metz, France
18 Sep 197152.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Metz, France
18 Sep 197152.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tela
11 Dec 197152.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tela
10 Jun 197555.8AppointedBishop of Saint-Claude, France
1 Dec 199475.3RetiredBishop of Saint-Claude, France
29 Nov 200990.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude, France

MicroData Summary for Gilbert-Antoine Duchêne
Bishop Gilbert-Antoine Duchêne (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint-Claude

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoussey
Ordained BishopSaint-Vincent, Cathedral, Metz, Diocese of Metz

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 846

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast