Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Jean Heintz

Deceased

Bishop of Metz, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jan 1886Born
21 May 191024.3Ordained PriestPriest
7 Dec 193347.8AppointedBishop of Troyes, France
25 Jan 193447.9Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
15 Feb 193852.0SelectedBishop of Metz, France
4 Mar 193852.0ConfirmedBishop of Metz, France
30 Nov 195872.8DiedBishop of Metz, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Jean Heintz
Bishop Joseph-Jean Heintz (born , died ) Bishop of Metz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReims

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1934, Number 6
  • c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 16, Number 846, Ascendance

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast