Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Emmanuel Savundaranayagam

Bishop Emeritus of Jaffna, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1938 Born
21 Dec 196325.4Ordained PriestPriest of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
24 Jan 198142.5AppointedBishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka
30 Jul 198143.0Ordained BishopBishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka
6 Jul 199253.9AppointedBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka
13 Oct 201577.2RetiredBishop of Jaffna, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Thomas Emmanuel Savundaranayagam
Bishop Thomas Emmanuel Savundaranayagam (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Jaffna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKayts
Ordained BishopOur Lady of Madhu, Basilica, Madhu, Diocese of Mannar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Jaffna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Oct 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 69, Number 5,484
  • ob.loc: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 101, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Apr 2021

Quantcast