Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rayappu Joseph

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Mannar, Sri Lanka


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1940Born
13 Dec 196727.6Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 199252.2AppointedBishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka
20 Oct 199252.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka
14 Jan 201675.7RetiredBishop of Mannar, Sri Lanka
1 Apr 202180.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Mannar, Sri Lanka

MicroData Summary for Rayappu Joseph
Bishop Rayappu Joseph (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Mannar

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDelft
Ordained BishopN.D. de Madhu, Shrine, Madhu
Death PlaceJaffna, Diocese of Jaffna

  • a priest for 53.3 years
  • a bishop for 28.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133, Number 11,983
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2016
  • d: CB, 1 Apr 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 1 Apr 2021

Quantcast