Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Amando Samo

Bishop Emeritus of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1948 Born
10 Dec 197729.3Ordained PriestPriest of Carolines-Marshalls, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
10 May 198738.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Carolines-Marshalls, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
10 May 198738.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Libertina
15 Aug 198738.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Libertina
3 Feb 199445.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
25 Mar 199546.6SucceededBishop of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
6 Jun 199546.8InstalledBishop of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)
2 Feb 202071.4ResignedBishop of Caroline Islands, Federated States of Micronesia, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Amando Samo
Bishop Amando Samo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Caroline Islands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMoch Island
Ordained BishopImmaculate Heart of Mary, Cathedral, Moen Island, Diocese of Carolines-Marshalls, Federated States of Micronesia

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Caroline Islands.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,152
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast