Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Caroline Islands

Dioecesis Carolinensium



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Julio Angkel, Bishop
  • Amando Samo, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Split: 23 April 1993
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Agaña
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Federated States of Micronesia
  • Region: Pacific (Oceania)
  • Square Kilometers: 2,150 (830 Square Miles)
  • Description: Comprises the four Federated States of Micronesia (Chuuk, Kosrae, Pohnpei and Yap) and the Republic of Palau.
  • Catholic Directory Abbreviation: CI
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofthecarolines.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 939, Chuuk, Caroline Islands, FSM 96942, Federated States of Micronesia
  • Telephone: 350-7273

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Western Carolines
15 May 1886Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Micronesia
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Western Carolines
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Eastern Carolines (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Caroline Islands
19 December 1905UnitedMission "Sui Iuris" of Eastern Carolines
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Western Carolines
Prefecture Apostolic of Caroline Islands (United and Elevated)
Vicariate Apostolic of Marianne and Caroline Islands
1 March 1911UnitedPrefecture Apostolic of Caroline Islands
Prefecture Apostolic of Marianne Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Marianne and Caroline Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands
4 May 1923UnitedVicariate Apostolic of Marshall Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Marianne and Caroline Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands
Vicariate Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands
4 July 1946Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Marianne, Caroline, and Marshall Islands Vicariate Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands (Name Changed and Territory Lost)
Vicariate Apostolic of Guam
Diocese of Carolines-Marshalls
3 May 1979ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands Diocese of Carolines-Marshalls
Diocese of Caroline Islands
23 April 1993SplitDiocese of Carolines-Marshalls Diocese of Caroline Islands
Prefecture Apostolic of Marshall Islands

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Caroline and Marshall Islands
194915,58245,61934.2%17179161310ap1951
196631,17478,77839.6%32329749459ap1967
197034,12782,02441.6%137388985147ap1971
197640,047100,63839.8%137381,0537463919ap1977
Diocese of Carolines-Marshalls
198048,711117,00041.6%231331,47621413225ap1981
199067,063134,12750.0%332351,91642334327ap1991
Diocese of Caroline Islands
199967,285129,47452.0%1011213,20439153924ap2000
200067,325132,56350.8%1211232,92741153323ap2001
200170,185135,83151.7%1314272,59941163326ap2002
200275,837136,94455.4%1314272,80841193330ap2003
200377,733140,36855.4%1318312,50741193326ap2004
200668,500128,71853.2%1215272,53740183327ap2007
201366,339132,15150.2%1511262,55144113331ap2014
201666,339132,15150.2%1511262,55144133331ap2017
201972,061137,69452.3%1614302,40277171733ap2020

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_d, v3.3.5, 7 Apr 2021; Data: 7 Apr 2021

Quantcast