Bishop(s)
|
General Information
|
Date | Event | From | To |
---|---|---|---|
15 August 1910 | Erected | Diocese of São Pedro do Rio Grande do Sul | Diocese of Pelotas (erected)
Diocese of Santa Maria (erected) Diocese of Uruguaiana (erected) |
25 June 1960 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Pelotas (Bagé, Lavras do Sul, and Pinheiro Machado)
Diocese of Uruguaiana (Cacequi, Dom Pedrito, General Vargas, Rosario do Sul, Santana do Livramento, and Sao Gabriel) | Diocese of Bagé (erected) |
22 May 1961 | Territory Lost | Diocese of Uruguaiana | Diocese of Santo Ângelo (erected) |
13 April 2011 | Metropolitan Changed | Diocese of Uruguaiana (from Porto Alegre) |
Year | Catholics | Total Population | Percent Catholic | Diocesan Priests | Religious Priests | Total Priests | Catholics Per Priest | Permanent Deacons | Male Religious | Female Religious | Parishes | Source |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1949 | 600,000 | 641,719 | 93.5% | 33 | 43 | 76 | 7,894 | 97 | 285 | 33 | ap1951 | |
1962 | 200,000 | 280,390 | 71.3% | 20 | 6 | 26 | 7,692 | 16 | 138 | 9 | ap1967 | |
1968 | 320,000 | 350,000 | 91.4% | 9 | 3 | 12 | 26,666 | 14 | 169 | 10 | ap1971 | |
1976 | 270,000 | 310,000 | 87.1% | 27 | 27 | 10,000 | 2 | 9 | 110 | 11 | ap1977 | |
1980 | 349,000 | 403,000 | 86.6% | 25 | 3 | 28 | 12,464 | 2 | 12 | 67 | 12 | ap1981 |
1990 | 388,000 | 426,000 | 91.1% | 21 | 2 | 23 | 16,869 | 5 | 11 | 115 | 12 | ap1991 |
1999 | 375,000 | 470,000 | 79.8% | 25 | 3 | 28 | 13,392 | 2 | 9 | 94 | 13 | ap2000 |
2000 | 385,000 | 480,000 | 80.2% | 25 | 2 | 27 | 14,259 | 2 | 6 | 77 | 15 | ap2001 |
2001 | 398,000 | 450,768 | 88.3% | 24 | 3 | 27 | 14,740 | 2 | 7 | 71 | 15 | ap2002 |
2002 | 398,000 | 450,768 | 88.3% | 24 | 3 | 27 | 14,740 | 1 | 7 | 72 | 15 | ap2003 |
2003 | 398,000 | 450,768 | 88.3% | 24 | 3 | 27 | 14,740 | 1 | 7 | 79 | 16 | ap2004 |
2004 | 323,062 | 434,887 | 74.3% | 20 | 1 | 21 | 15,383 | 1 | 8 | 81 | 16 | ap2005 |
2010 | 348,000 | 467,000 | 74.5% | 21 | 2 | 23 | 15,130 | 1 | 7 | 61 | 16 | ap2011 |
2014 | 365,000 | 490,000 | 74.5% | 23 | 3 | 26 | 14,038 | 9 | 54 | 16 | ap2015 | |
2017 | 374,200 | 502,300 | 74.5% | 22 | 2 | 24 | 15,591 | 7 | 46 | 16 | ap2018 | |
2020 | 382,900 | 514,000 | 74.5% | 24 | 2 | 26 | 14,726 | 6 | 48 | 16 | ap2021 |
Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023 Code: web_d, v3.4.4, 25 Feb 2023; Data: 19 Aug 2023 |
✠