Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jude Saint-Antoine

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montréal, Québec, Canada

Titular Bishop of Scardona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Oct 1930 Born
31 May 195625.5Ordained PriestPriest of Montréal, Québec, Canada
20 Mar 198150.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada
20 Mar 198150.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Scardona
22 May 198150.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Scardona
11 Feb 200675.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Montréal, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Jude Saint-Antoine
Bishop Jude Saint-Antoine (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Montréal

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec
Ordained BishopCathedral, Montréal, Archdiocese of Montréal, Québec

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Montréal.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2006
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 68, Number 5,381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 27 Nov 2020

Quantcast